Roberts v. Topre America Corporation
Plaintiff: Monica Roberts
Defendant: Topre America Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00971
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/22/2019. (AHI )
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Topre America Corporation (Brown, Whitney)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Topre America Corporation.(Brown, Whitney)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Topre America Corporation served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (AHI)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Topre America Corporation. (AHI)
June 25, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3376764 (B4601098643). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Topre America Corporation filed by Monica Roberts. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(AHI). (Arnold, Allen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 CONFLICT Disclosure Statement by Monica Roberts (AHI)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Monica Roberts. (AHI)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Topre America Corporation filed by Monica Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Topre America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Roberts
Represented By: Allen Durham Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topre America Corporation
Represented By: Whitney R Brown
Represented By: David J Middlebrooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?