Scannng Technologies Innovations LLC v. FastTraxPos LLC
Plaintiff: Scannng Technologies Innovations LLC
Defendant: FastTraxPos LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00993
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. FastTraxPos LLC answer due 9/20/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/21/2019. (LMC, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading Motion is RIPE 8/21/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by FastTraxPos LLC. (Holt, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Holt on behalf of FastTraxPos LLC (Holt, Angela)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David W Holt on behalf of FastTraxPos LLC (Holt, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scannng Technologies Innovations LLC. FastTraxPos LLC served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (McDavid, Stephan)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to FastTraxPos LLC by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
July 18, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3392795 (b4601099237). related document #1 COMPLAINT against FastTraxPos LLC filed by Scannng Technologies Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(AHI ). (McDavid, Stephan)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FastTraxPos LLC filed by Scannng Technologies Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AHI )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scannng Technologies Innovations LLC v. FastTraxPos LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scannng Technologies Innovations LLC
Represented By: Stephan Land McDavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FastTraxPos LLC
Represented By: David W Holt
Represented By: Angela Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?