Cameron v. QC Wellness LLC et al
Plaintiff: Misty Cameron
Defendant: QuickCare RX LLC, QC Pharmacy LLC, QC Wellness LLC, QuickCare Holdings LLC and QuickCare Urgent LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01098
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: that certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 5/19/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 6/18/2020; Witness and Exhibit Lists due by 7/20/2020; Trial ready by 8/2020. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/10/2019. (AHI)
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Smith, Lauren)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 08/15/19. (SPT )
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QuickCare Urgent LLC. filed by QuickCare Urgent LLC (Smith, Lauren)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QuickCare RX LLC. filed by QuickCare RX LLC (Smith, Lauren)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QuickCare Holdings LLC. filed by QuickCare Holdings LLC (Smith, Lauren)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QC Wellness LLC. filed by QC Wellness LLC (Smith, Lauren)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QC Pharmacy LLC. filed by QC Pharmacy LLC (Smith, Lauren)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by QuickCare Urgent LLC.(Smith, Lauren)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by QuickCare RX LLC.(Smith, Lauren)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by QuickCare Holdings LLC.(Smith, Lauren)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by QC Wellness LLC.(Smith, Lauren)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by QC Pharmacy LLC.(Smith, Lauren)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Misty Cameron. QC Wellness LLC served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Artrip, Eric)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Misty Cameron. QuickCare Urgent LLC served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Artrip, Eric)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Misty Cameron. QuickCare RX LLC served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Artrip, Eric)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Misty Cameron. QuickCare Holdings LLC served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Artrip, Eric)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Misty Cameron. QC Pharmacy LLC served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Artrip, Eric)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued by the clerk and hand delivered to plaintiff for service as to QC Pharmacy LLC, QC Wellness LLC, QuickCare Holdings LLC, QuickCare RX LLC, and QuickCare Urgent LLC. (AHI)
July 18, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3393108 (b4601099238). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against All Defendants filed by Misty Cameron. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(AHI ). (Artrip, Eric)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against All Defendants filed by Misty Cameron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(AHI )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cameron v. QC Wellness LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QuickCare RX LLC
Represented By: Lauren A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QC Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Lauren A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QC Wellness LLC
Represented By: Lauren A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QuickCare Holdings LLC
Represented By: Lauren A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QuickCare Urgent LLC
Represented By: Lauren A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Cameron
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Teresa Ryder Mastando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?