Ganoe v. Medical Data Systems Inc
Plaintiff: Julia Ganoe
Defendant: Medical Data Systems Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv01100
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Medical Data Systems Inc. filed by Medical Data Systems Inc (Leeth, Alan)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Medical Data Systems Inc.(Leeth, Alan)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 08/15/19. (SPT )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to filed responsive pleading. Responsive pleading is now due on or before 8/28/2019. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/14/2019. (CT)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Medical Data Systems Inc. (Leeth, Alan)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julia Ganoe. Medical Data Systems Inc served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (KEK)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Medical Data Systems Inc. (AHI)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Julia Ganoe. (Seals, W)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Julia Ganoe. (Seals, W)
July 16, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3390916 (b4601099170). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Medical Data Systems Inc filed by Julia Ganoe.(AHI). (Seals, W)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Medical Data Systems Inc filed by Julia Ganoe.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ganoe v. Medical Data Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Data Systems Inc
Represented By: Alan D Leeth
Represented By: Rachel R Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Ganoe
Represented By: W Whitney Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?