Carusone v. Nintendo of America, Inc
Plaintiff: Gillian Carusone
Defendant: Nintendo of America, Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv01183
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion is RIPE 9/12/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Nintendo of America, Inc. (Nicholson, Christopher)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David J. Burman; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric J. Weiss; and granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mallory Gitt Webster. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/3/19. (BJL)
August 23, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3418565 (receipt number B4601100082). (Nicholson, Christopher) Modified on 8/26/2019 (BJL).
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mallory Gitt Webster Motion is RIPE 8/23/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Nintendo of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Statement in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Nicholson, Christopher)
August 23, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3418559 (receipt number B4601100080). (Nicholson, Christopher) Modified on 8/26/2019 (BJL).
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric J. Weiss Motion is RIPE 8/23/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Nintendo of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Statement in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Nicholson, Christopher)
August 23, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3418545 (receipt number B4601100081). (Nicholson, Christopher) Modified on 8/26/2019 (BJL).
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David J. Burman Motion is RIPE 8/23/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Nintendo of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Statement in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Nicholson, Christopher)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Regarding Stipulation to Extend Deadlines that Nintendo's answer or other responsive pleading is due 11/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/20/2019. (AHI)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant Nintendo of America Inc. to Answer or Respond to Complaint by Nintendo of America, Inc. filed by Nintendo of America, Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nicholson, Christopher)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gillian Carusone. Nintendo of America, Inc served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Artrip, Eric)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nintendo of America, Inc by Clerk and given to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
July 25, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3398049 (receipt number B4601099369). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Nintendo of America, Inc filed by Gillian Carusone.(BJL). (Mastando, Teresa) Modified on 7/26/2019 (BJL).
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Nintendo of America, Inc filed by Gillian Carusone.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carusone v. Nintendo of America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gillian Carusone
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo of America, Inc
Represented By: Gregory H Hawley
Represented By: Eric J Weiss
Represented By: David J. Burman
Represented By: Christopher J Nicholson
Represented By: Mallory Gitt Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?