American Associated Pharmacies et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: American Associated Pharmacies and Associated Pharmacies Inc
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv01295
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baker, Joshua)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the #8 Motion to Remand is DENIED and the #11 Motion for Leave to File a Reply is DENIED; the parties are ORDERED to meet and file their report of parties planning meeting by 10/11/2019. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 10/3/2019. (AHI)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Remand by American Associated Pharmacies, Associated Pharmacies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, Joshua)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 Opposition to re #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Salter, Scott)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Defendant is ORDERED to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand on or before September 27, 2019. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 9/13/19. (BJL)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by American Associated Pharmacies, Associated Pharmacies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, Joshua)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Counterclaim by American Associated Pharmacies, Associated Pharmacies Inc.(Baker, Joshua)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Cameron Stephens on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Stephens, Keith)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stewart James Alvis on behalf of American Associated Pharmacies, Associated Pharmacies Inc (Alvis, Stewart)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 8/20/2019. (AHI)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against American Associated Pharmacies, Associated Pharmacies Inc by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Salter, Scott)
August 14, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601099861 (AHI)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (AHI)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Alabama, case number 39-CV-2019-900154 with jury demand contained within the body of the complaint filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Associated Pharmacies et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Associated Pharmacies
Represented By: David R Beasley
Represented By: Joshua B Baker
Represented By: Walter A Dodgen, Jr
Represented By: Stewart James Alvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Associated Pharmacies Inc
Represented By: David R Beasley
Represented By: Joshua B Baker
Represented By: Walter A Dodgen, Jr
Represented By: Stewart James Alvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott M Salter
Represented By: Keith Cameron Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?