Smith v. G&G Quick Stop LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Smith
Defendant: G&G Quick Stop LLC, T&T Grocery LLC and Sweetland Grocery
Case Number: 5:2019cv01298
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed G&G Quick Stop LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Sweetland Grocery served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; T&T Grocery LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (AHI)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to G&G Quick Stop LLC, Sweetland Grocery, and T&T Grocery LLC. (AHI)
August 13, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3411515 (B4601099858). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John Smith.(AHI). (Taylor, Cassie)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by John Smith. (AHI)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CONFLICT Disclosure Statement by John Smith (AHI)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John Smith.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. G&G Quick Stop LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&G Quick Stop LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&T Grocery LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetland Grocery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Smith
Represented By: L Landis Sexton
Represented By: Cassie Elizabeth Taylor
Represented By: Tracy Gwyn Birdsong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?