Stewart v. Convanta Huntsville Inc
Plaintiff: Terrence Stewart
Defendant: Convanta Huntsville Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv01324
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Convanta Huntsville Inc. filed by Convanta Huntsville Inc (Umbach, Arnold)
September 30, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3445670 (ALND B4601100932). (Umbach, Arnold) Modified on 9/30/2019 (KEK).
September 30, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3445664 (ALND B4601100931). (Umbach, Arnold) Modified on 9/30/2019 (KEK).
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Erin J. Olesen by Convanta Huntsville Inc. (Umbach, Arnold)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher S. Feudo by Convanta Huntsville Inc. (Umbach, Arnold)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Convanta Huntsville Inc.(Umbach, Arnold)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER . Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/24/2019. (KEK)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Please use case number 5:19-cv-1324-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Arnold William Umbach, III on behalf of Convanta Huntsville Inc (Umbach, Arnold)
August 22, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number H4601004179 (BJL)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Convanta Huntsville Inc by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Convanta Huntsville Inc filed by Terrence Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Convanta Huntsville Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Stewart
Represented By: Michael E Auffenorde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convanta Huntsville Inc
Represented By: Christopher S Feudo
Represented By: Erin Olesen
Represented By: Arnold William Umbach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?