Redline Steel LLC v. Nukon Lazer Makine Metal Sanayi ve Tic AS et al
Plaintiff: Redline Steel LLC
Defendant: Moore Machine Tools LLC, NukonUS LLC and Nukon Lazer Makine Metal Sanayi ve Tic AS
Case Number: 5:2019cv01445
Filed: September 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - [Proposed] Protective and Clawback Order)(Robinson, James)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Moore Machine Tools LLC, Nukon Lazer Makine Metal Sanayi ve Tic AS, NukonUS LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Amended) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Joseph Shapiro, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Metin Ertufan, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Matthew Moore)(Shapiro, Joseph)
October 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 10/16/2019 re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (YMB)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER - Before the Court is defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. (Doc. #8 ). The Court SETS this matter for a telephone conference at 2:45 PM on Wednesday, October 16, 2019. Counsel of record shall please dial 877-810-9415 and enter access code 5036215 to participate in the call. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/10/2019. (KEK)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Moore Machine Tools LLC, Nukon Lazer Makine Metal Sanayi ve Tic AS, NukonUS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Metin Ertufan, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Matthew Moore)(Shapiro, Joseph)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Entry of Standard Initial Order and Extension of Deadline for 26(f) Conference by Redline Steel LLC. (Robinson, James)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants the parties' joint motion for extension of time. (Doc. #5 ). Defendant Nukon Lazer Makine Metal Sanayi ve Tic AS shall respond to the Complaint on or before 9/27/2019. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/19/2019. (YMB)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Nukon Lazer Makine Metal Sanayi ve Tic AS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Shapiro, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Redline Steel, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim Redline Steel, LLC's Answer to NukonUS, LLC Counterclaims by Redline Steel LLC.(Robinson, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601100528. (KEK)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS Attorney Gregory H. Revera's motion to admit Joseph Shapiro pro hac vice in this action. (Doc. #2 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/4/2019. (YMB)
September 3, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3426106 (ALND B4601100330). (Revera, Gregory) Modified on 9/4/2019 (KEK).
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Shapiro by Moore Machine Tools LLC, Nukon Lazer Makine Metal Sanayi ve Tic AS, NukonUS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of J. Shapiro)(Revera, Gregory)
September 3, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and COUNTERCLAIM against Redline Steel LLC by NukonUS LLC, Moore Machine Tools LLC - see Doc 1, Exh 1, pages 33-45. (KEK)
September 3, 2019 State Complaint filed 8/9/19 - see Doc 1, Exh 1, pages 2-17. (KEK)
September 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Moore Machine Tools LLC, NukonUS LLC, Nukon Lazer Makine Metal Sanayi ve Tic AS from Circuit Court of Limestone County, Alabama, case number 44-cv-2019-900242, filed by Moore Machine Tools LLC, NukonUS LLC, Nukon Lazer Makine Metal Sanayi ve Tic AS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redline Steel LLC v. Nukon Lazer Makine Metal Sanayi ve Tic AS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore Machine Tools LLC
Represented By: Gregory H Revera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NukonUS LLC
Represented By: Gregory H Revera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nukon Lazer Makine Metal Sanayi ve Tic AS
Represented By: Gregory H Revera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redline Steel LLC
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: James Hunter Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?