Raybon v. Haier U.S. Appliances Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Edward L Raybon
Defendant: Haier U.S. Appliances Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01504
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Edward L Raybon. Haier U.S. Appliances Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/1/2019. (Winston, Lee)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Request for service by certified mail filed by Edward L Raybon. (Winston, Lee)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Edward L Raybon re #3 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC CHARGE AND RIGHT TO SUE LETTER)(Winston, Lee)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the plaintiff is to file copies of the EEOC Charge and Dismissal and Notice of Rights letter by 10/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/2/2019. (AHI)
October 1, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3446737 (B5601100958). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Haier U.S. Appliances Solutions, Inc. filed by Edward L Raybon.(BJL). (Winston, Lee)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Haier U.S. Appliances Solutions, Inc. filed by Edward L Raybon.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raybon v. Haier U.S. Appliances Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haier U.S. Appliances Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward L Raybon
Represented By: Lee David Winston
Represented By: Roderick T Cooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?