Bishop v. Sportsmed Orthopaedic Specialists PC
Plaintiff: Misty Bishop
Defendant: Sportsmed Orthopaedic Specialists PC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01506
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sportsmed Orthopaedic Specialists PC. filed by Sportsmed Orthopaedic Specialists PC (Guarino, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than December 9, 2019, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/24/19. (BJL)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 09:15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/24/19. (BJL)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/24/19. (BJL)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hayden Ford Bashinski on behalf of Sportsmed Orthopaedic Specialists PC (Bashinski, Hayden)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sportsmed Orthopaedic Specialists PC.(Guarino, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Misty Bishop. Sportsmed Orthopaedic Specialists PC served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Wrady, Joshua)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sportsmed Orthopaedic Specialists PC by Clerk for service and delivered to Plaintiff. (BJL)
September 16, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3434473 (receipt number B4601100625). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Sportsmed Orthopaedic Specialists PC filed by Misty Bishop.(BJL). (Wrady, Joshua) Modified on 9/17/2019 (BJL).
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Sportsmed Orthopaedic Specialists PC filed by Misty Bishop.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop v. Sportsmed Orthopaedic Specialists PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Bishop
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Wrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sportsmed Orthopaedic Specialists PC
Represented By: Hayden Ford Bashinski
Represented By: Michael C Guarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?