Pierce v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Yvaughan Pierce
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2019cv01544
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yvaughan Pierce. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (KAM)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Kathleen Fishel on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner (Fishel, Shannon)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General del to USM (KAM)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 9/19/2019. (SJB)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE that the plaintiff is required to provide her social security number to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. This notice is to be made outside of the CM/ECF filing system. (KAM)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 9/17/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Yvaughan Pierce. (KAM)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Yvaughan Pierce.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvaughan Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?