Boyette v. Adams
Plaintiff: Rhonda Boyette
Defendant: Marcus Adams
Case Number: 5:2019cv01802
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Rhonda Boyette. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint)(Sherrod, Henry)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than January 30, 2020, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/16/19. (BJL)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/16/19. (BJL)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/16/19. (BJL)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Defendant filed a Motion for More Definite Statement. The court ORDERS Plaintiff to respond to the motion within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. The court orders Defendant to file a reply within seven (7) days of Plaintiffs response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/16/19. (BJL)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Marcus Adams. (Canupp, David)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint by December 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on December 2, 2019. (ADH)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time (UNOPPOSED) Motion is RIPE 12/2/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Marcus Adams. (Canupp, David)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Marcus Adams served on 11/16/2019, answer due 12/7/2019. (BJL)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Marcus Adams by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
November 6, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3473290 (receipt number B4601101896). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Marcus Adams filed by Rhonda Boyette. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(BJL). (Sherrod, Henry) Modified on 11/7/2019 (BJL).
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Rhonda Boyette. (BJL)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Marcus Adams filed by Rhonda Boyette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyette v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Boyette
Represented By: Henry F Sherrod, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Adams
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?