Edger v. McCabe et al
Plaintiff: Roland Edger
Defendant: Krista McCabe and The City of Huntsville, Alabama
Case Number: 5:2019cv01977
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/6/2020. (AHI)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: that certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 9/28/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 10/28/2020; Witness and Exhibit Lists due by 1/15/2021; Trial ready by 2/2021. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 1/31/2020. (AHI)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Burgess, C)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Roland Edger. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint)(Sherrod, Henry) Modified on 1/30/2020 (AHI).
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Krista McCabe.(Burgess, C)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The City of Huntsville, Alabama.(Burgess, C)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Krista McCabe served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (BJL)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed The City of Huntsville, Alabama served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (AHI)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Krista McCabe and The City of Huntsville, Alabama. (AHI)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Roland Edger. (BJL)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Krista McCabe and The City of Huntsville, Alabama, filed by Roland Edger.(BJL)
December 9, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3492843 (B4601102616). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Krista McCabe and The City of Huntsville, Alabama, filed by Roland Edger.(BJL). (Sherrod, Henry) Modified on 12/10/2019 (AHI).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edger v. McCabe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krista McCabe
Represented By: C Gregory Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Huntsville, Alabama
Represented By: C Gregory Burgess
Represented By: Lauren A Smith
Represented By: Stephanie Margaret Gushlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Edger
Represented By: Henry F Sherrod, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?