Hazel Green Family Practice LLC et al v. Universal Healthcare Network LLC
Plaintiff: Dr. Bob Newbell and Hazel Green Family Practice LLC
Defendant: Universal Healthcare Network LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv02077
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/6/2020. (AHI)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 1/31/2020. (KBW)
January 30, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3525891 (B4601103660). (Cummins, Timothy) Modified on 1/31/2020 (AHI).
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lucas Morgan by Universal Healthcare Network LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Cummins, Timothy)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 1/28/2020. (KBW)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Universal Healthcare Network LLC answer due 2/22/2020.. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 1/28/2020. (KBW)
January 27, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3522827 (B4601103602). (Cummins, Timothy) Modified on 1/29/2020 (AHI).
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Todd Mizeski by Universal Healthcare Network LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Cummins, Timothy)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Universal Healthcare Network LLC. (Cummins, Timothy)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hazel Green Family Practice LLC and Bob Newbell. Universal Healthcare Network LLC served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Rodgers, Robert) Modified on 1/10/2020 (AHI).
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiffs for service as to Universal Healthcare Network LLC. (AHI)
December 20, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3501467 (B4601102870). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Universal Healthcare Network LLC filed by Hazel Green Family Practice LLC and Bob Newbell.(BJL). (Rodgers, Robert) Modified on 12/26/2019 (AHI).
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Universal Healthcare Network LLC filed by Hazel Green Family Practice LLC and Bob Newbell.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hazel Green Family Practice LLC et al v. Universal Healthcare Network LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Bob Newbell
Represented By: Robert V Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Green Family Practice LLC
Represented By: Robert V Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Healthcare Network LLC
Represented By: Timothy P Cummins
Represented By: Lucas W Morgan
Represented By: Todd Mizeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?