White v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Case Number: 5:2019cv08029
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Northeastern Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00474. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 14, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/14/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION and ORDER directing as follows: (1) the #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge is adopted; (2) this case is transferred to the US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama; (3) the pending #7 Motion is left for resolution by the transferee court; directing the clerk to take the appropriate steps to effect the transfer; this case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/14/19. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/14/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Rule 5.1 Challenge, filed by Donald Ray White. (am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/14/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by Donald Ray White. (dmn, ) (entitled "Notice of Appeal") [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/14/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE RECOMMENDING that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 1631; Objections to R&R due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/5/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/14/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: It is ORDERED that petitioner's #3 objections are OVERRULED. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/16/2019. (am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/14/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Objections to re #2 Order, filed by Donald Ray White. (am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/14/2019.]
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED that: 1. The instant petition be construed as a motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. 2. The United States of America shall henceforth be listed as the sole respondent in this case. 3. On or before July 19, 2019, White shall inform the court if he wishes to do one of the following: (a) Continue to proceed only on the claims he presents in the construed 2255 motion; or (b) Amend the construed 2255 motion to assert any additional claims he wishes to assert under 2255 in challenging his convictions and sentences; or (c) Withdraw the construed 2255 motion and dismiss this action. White is cautioned that if he fails to file a response in compliance with this order, which requires that he advise the court of whether he wishes to do one of the above options, this cause shall proceed as an action under 28 U.S.C. 2255, as to only those claims presented in the construed 2255 motion (Doc. #1 ). Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/5/2019. (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/14/2019.]
July 3, 2019 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Donald Ray White.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/14/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 (CONSTRUED AS A 2255 MOTION PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #2 ORDER) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Donald Ray White. (No Filing Fee; No IFP) (bes, ) Modified on 7/8/2019 (kh, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?