Barber v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Jamie Lee Barber
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2020cv00627
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 6/22/2020, answer due 9/20/2020. (BJL)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to USMS for service as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (AHI )
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/29/2020. (KBW)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamie Lee Barber. (Attachments: #1 IFP Affidavit)(AHI)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner filed by Jamie Lee Barber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AHI)
May 5, 2020 NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. The notice is to be given to the US Attorney outside of the electronic filing system. (AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Lee Barber
Represented By: Seth B Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?