Leslie v. Redstone Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Heather Leslie
Defendant: Redstone Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 5:2020cv00629
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Demko, Andrew)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/10/2020. (KBW)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/10/2020. (KBW)
June 9, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3606668 (B4601106477). (Stephens, H) Modified on 6/11/2020 (AHI).
June 9, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3606623 (B4601106476). (Stephens, H) Modified on 6/11/2020 (AHI).
June 9, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac vice of Stuart Richter by Redstone Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Stephens, H)
June 9, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Demko by Redstone Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Stephens, H)
May 29, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Redstone Federal Credit Union. filed by Redstone Federal Credit Union (Stephens, H)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Redstone Federal Credit Union answer or other responsive pleading due by 7/17/2020. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/29/2020. (KBW)
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Redstone Federal Credit Union. (Stephens, H)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/22/2020. (AHI)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Please use case number 5:20-cv-629-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
May 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Adam Danella on behalf of Redstone Federal Credit Union (Danella, Nicholas)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by H Harold Stephens on behalf of Redstone Federal Credit Union (Stephens, H)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff Heather Leslie filed a Motion for Leave for Arthur Stock to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Motion for Leave for Lisa White to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and a Motion for Leave for Ryan McMillan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The court GRANTS the motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/15/20. (BJL)
May 15, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3591975 (B4601106006). (Lutz, Hirlye) Modified on 5/18/2020 (BJL).
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ryan McMillan Motion is RIPE 5/15/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Heather Leslie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lutz, Hirlye)
May 15, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3591971 (b4601106005). (Lutz, Hirlye) Modified on 5/18/2020 (BJL).
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lisa White Motion is RIPE 5/15/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Heather Leslie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lutz, Hirlye)
May 15, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3591965 (B4601106004). (Lutz, Hirlye) Modified on 5/18/2020 (BJL).
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Arthur Stock Motion is RIPE 5/15/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Heather Leslie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lutz, Hirlye)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Redstone Federal Credit Union no date given with signature (AHI )
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Redstone Federal Credit Union. (AHI)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Heather Leslie. (Lutz, Hirlye)
May 5, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3584424 (receipt number B4601105758). related document #1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Redstone Federal Credit Union filed by Heather Leslie. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(AHI). (Lutz, Hirlye) Modified on 5/6/2020 (BJL).
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (AHI)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Redstone Federal Credit Union filed by Heather Leslie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leslie v. Redstone Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Leslie
Represented By: Hirlye Ray Lutz, III
Represented By: Frank Jerome Tapley
Represented By: Leila H Watson
Represented By: Ryan P McMillan
Represented By: Arthur M Stock
Represented By: Lisa A White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redstone Federal Credit Union
Represented By: H Harold Stephens
Represented By: Stuart M Richter
Represented By: Andrew J Demko
Represented By: Nicholas Adam Danella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?