Bowling v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: James Ashley Bowling
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2020cv00641
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: Social Security Administration, Commissioner answer due 8/4/2020. (MRR, )
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by James Ashley Bowling. (McCleney, Amanda) Modified text on 6/4/2020 (MRR, ).
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, returned to pltf for service (MRR, )
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number H4601004468 (MRR, ) Modified on 5/15/2020 (MRR, ).
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days from the entry date of this notice. The notice is to be given to the US Attorney outside of the electronic filing system. (MRR, )
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by James Ashley Bowling. (MRR, )
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by James Ashley Bowling.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowling v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ashley Bowling
Represented By: Amanda Leigh McCleney
Represented By: John Zachariah Higgs, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?