Thomas v. Bowman Electric Inc
Plaintiff: David P Thomas
Defendant: Bowman Electric Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv00691
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bowman Electric Inc shall file a responsive pleading by July 23, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on June 23, 2020. (HKM)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 6/23/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Bowman Electric Inc. (McKinney, Rebekah)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Bowman Electric Inc. (McKinney, Rebekah)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah Keith McKinney on behalf of Bowman Electric Inc (McKinney, Rebekah)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bowman Electric Inc by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
May 18, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3592453 (B4601106019). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Bowman Electric Inc filed by David P Thomas.(BJL). (Baxter, James) Modified on 5/19/2020 (BJL).
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Bowman Electric Inc filed by David P Thomas.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Bowman Electric Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowman Electric Inc
Represented By: Rebekah Keith McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David P Thomas
Represented By: James T Baxter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?