Ohls v. Captain D's LLC
Plaintiff: Sherry Ohls
Defendant: Captain D's LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00859
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/3/20. (BJL)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/1/2021. Motions due by 8/2/2021. The parties shall be ready for trial to be scheduled on or after 11/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/3/20. (BJL)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/3/20. (BJL)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Sherry Ohls and Captain D's LLC. (BJL)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sewell, Robert)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than August 3, 2020, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/17/20. (BJL)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 7/17/2020 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/17/20. (BJL)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/17/20. (BJL)
June 17, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3612330 B4601106628). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Captain D's LLC from Circuit Court of Cullman County, Alabama, case number 25-CV-2020-900143. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(BJL). (Sewell, Robert) Modified on 6/19/2020 (AHI ).
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Captain D's LLC.(BJL)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Captain D's LLC (BJL)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Captain D's LLC from Circuit Court of Cullman County, Alabama, case number 25-CV-2020-900143. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohls v. Captain D's LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain D's LLC
Represented By: Michael L Bell
Represented By: Robert Jackson Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Ohls
Represented By: James R Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?