Frost v. Carter et al
Plaintiff: David Scott Frost
Defendant: Russell Eason, Lee Carter and Winston County Circuit Court
Case Number: 5:2020cv00864
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Prisoner Consent Form #4 by David Scott Frost (MEB2)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The plaintiff has submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by certified copies of his jail and/or prison account statements. (Doc. #3 ). The application is GRANTED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). The undersigned therefore ORDERS the plaintiff to sign and return to the Clerk of Court, within thirty (30) days of the entry date of this Order, the attached Prisoner Consent Form to signify that he wishes to continue with this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/20/2020. (KEK)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Scott Frost. (AKD)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING- The plaintiff failed to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee of $350 and administrative fee of $50. The plaintiff must either file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay a total of $400 ($350 filing fee + $50 administrative fee) to the Clerk of the Court within thirty (30) days. An application to proceed in forma pauperis must be signed by the plaintiff and must be accompanied by a certified copy of prison account statements for the last six months. The plaintiff must write 5:20-cv-00864-AKK-SGC at the top of the first page of the application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 06/23/2020. (AKD)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lee Carter, Russell Eason, Winston County Circuit Court, filed by David Scott Frost.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frost v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winston County Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Scott Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?