Old Town II LLC et al v. Oppidan Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Town Madison Business Association Inc, Old Town Investments LLC and Old Town II LLC
Defendant: Oppidan Holdings LLC, CIM DU Madison AL LLC and KTJ 330 LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv01023
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: the court GRANTS the motion to stay, STAYS all discovery pending a ruling on the motions to dismiss, and ORDERS the parties to file a Rule 26(f) report within 14 days after a ruling on the motions to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/31/20. (BJL)
August 28, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery by CIM DU Madison AL LLC. (Pruet, David)
August 28, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY Brief filed by Defendants KTJ 330 LLC, Oppidan Holdings LLC re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, III, IV and V filed by KTJ 330 LLC, Oppidan Holdings LLC. (Ragsdale, Barry)
August 27, 2020 Filing 22 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Old Town II LLC, Town Madison Business Association Inc, Oppidan Holdings LLC, Old Town Investments LLC, KTJ 330 LLC, and CIM DU Madison AL LLC. (BJL)
August 25, 2020 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Old Town II LLC, Old Town Investments LLC, Town Madison Business Association Inc. filed by Old Town II LLC, Old Town Investments LLC, Town Madison Business Association Inc (Mardis, Zachary)
August 21, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, III, IV and V Plaintiffs' Opposition to Oppidan Holdings, LLC and KTJ 330, LLC's Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Old Town II LLC, Old Town Investments LLC, Town Madison Business Association Inc. (Mardis, Zachary)
August 21, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KTJ 330 LLC, Oppidan Holdings LLC. filed by KTJ 330 LLC, Oppidan Holdings LLC (Cole, Meghan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CIM DU Madison AL LLC. filed by CIM DU Madison AL LLC (Pruet, David)
August 17, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 8/17/2020. (SHB, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant CIM DU Madison AL LLC re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CIM DU Madison AL LLC. (Pruet, David)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/7/20. (BJL)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss within 14 days from the entry date of this order. Defendants shall file any reply within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/7/20. (BJL)
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, III, IV and V by KTJ 330 LLC, Oppidan Holdings LLC. (Ragsdale, Barry)
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Opposition to CIM DU Madison AL, LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Old Town II LLC, Old Town Investments LLC, Town Madison Business Association Inc. (Mardis, Zachary)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Salvati Cole on behalf of KTJ 330 LLC, Oppidan Holdings LLC (Cole, Meghan)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry A Ragsdale on behalf of KTJ 330 LLC, Oppidan Holdings LLC (Ragsdale, Barry)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 ***Document Sealed*** MOTION TO DISMISS #4 SEALED EXHIBITS A-F. (BJL)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CIM DU Madison AL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pruet, David)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than August 31, 2020, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/20/20. (BJL)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court SETS a telephone status conference for 10:45 a.m. on Monday, August 17, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/20/20. (BJL)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss within fourteen days from the entry date of this order. Defendant shall file any reply within seven days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/20/20. (BJL)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Seal. The court ORDERS Defendant CIM DU Madison AL to deliver the evidentiary materials to the Clerks office for filing under seal. This order shall not preclude any party from filing a motion to lift the seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/20/20. (BJL)
July 20, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3632296 (B4601107232). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by CIM DU Madison AL LLC from the Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-CV-2020-900837. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(BJL). (Pruet, David) Modified on 7/21/2020 (BJL).
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal exhibits to Motion to Dismiss by CIM DU Madison AL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pruet, David)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by CIM DU Madison AL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Ex E, #6 Ex F)(Pruet, David)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by CIM DU Madison AL LLC from the Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-CV-2020-900837. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old Town II LLC et al v. Oppidan Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oppidan Holdings LLC
Represented By: Barry A Ragsdale
Represented By: Meghan Salvati Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIM DU Madison AL LLC
Represented By: Amie Adelia Vague
Represented By: David R Pruet, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KTJ 330 LLC
Represented By: Barry A Ragsdale
Represented By: Meghan Salvati Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town Madison Business Association Inc
Represented By: David R Beasley
Represented By: Walter A Dodgen, Jr
Represented By: Zachary Paul Mardis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Town Investments LLC
Represented By: David R Beasley
Represented By: Walter A Dodgen, Jr
Represented By: Zachary Paul Mardis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Town II LLC
Represented By: David R Beasley
Represented By: Walter A Dodgen, Jr
Represented By: Zachary Paul Mardis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?