Cornelison v. Southern Synergy Inc
Plaintiff: Steven Cornelison
Defendant: Southern Synergy Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01157
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Referring Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Southern Synergy Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hancock, William)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 9/10/2020. (AHI)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable C. Lynwood Smith, Jr.. Please use case number 5:20-cv-1157-CLS on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N. Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura L Decker on behalf of Southern Synergy Inc (Decker, Laura)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William K Hancock on behalf of Southern Synergy Inc (Hancock, William)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave for Gabriel A. Assaad to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/31/20. (BJL)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gabriel A. Assaad Motion is RIPE 8/28/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Steven Cornelison. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificates of Good Standing)(VanDerVeer, Nathan)
August 28, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3661385 (B4601108097). (VanDerVeer, Nathan) Modified on 8/31/2020 (BJL).
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Cornelison. Southern Synergy Inc served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (VanDerVeer, Nathan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Southern Synergy Inc. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (MEB2)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Southern Synergy Inc filed by Steven Cornelison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BJL)
August 11, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3647943 (B4601107721). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Southern Synergy Inc filed by Steven Cornelison. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(BJL). (VanDerVeer, Nathan) Modified on 8/12/2020 (BJL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornelison v. Southern Synergy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Synergy Inc
Represented By: William K Hancock
Represented By: Laura L Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Cornelison
Represented By: Nathan C VanDerVeer
Represented By: Justin C Owen
Represented By: Gabriel A Assaad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?