Duck v. Ivey et al
Plaintiff: Robert Duck
Defendant: Jeff Dunn, William Streeter, Alabama Department of Corrections, Kay Ivey, Deborah Toney and Scarlett Robinson
Case Number: 5:2020cv01205
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: the warden or chief jailer of the jail or prison in which the plaintiff is housed is DIRECTED to deduct and withhold from any deposits made by or on behalf of the plaintiff into any inmate account at the facility a sum equivalent to twenty percent of the total deposits each month after the first $10.00 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/24/20. (BJL)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER Consent Form by Robert Duck (AHI)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is not required to pay a partial filing fee, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/1/2020. (AHI)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Duck. (AHI)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Jeff Dunn, Kay Ivey, and William Streeter filed by Robert Duck.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duck v. Ivey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Streeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scarlett Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Duck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?