Moncrief v. Tenneco Inc
Plaintiff: Lon Moncrief, III
Defendant: Tenneco Inc doing business as Federal-Mogul Powertrain and Federal-Mogul Powertrain LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv01215
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/14/20. (BJL)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/11/2021. Motions due by 7/9/2021. The parties shall be ready for trial to be scheduled on or after 12/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/14/20. (BJL)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Substitute Party. Federal-Mogul Powertrain LLC added. Tenneco Inc terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/14/20. (BJL)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled on 10/21/2020 is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/14/20. (BJL)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Tenneco Inc and Lon Moncrief, III. (BJL)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant to Correct Name Motion is RIPE 10/13/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Lon Moncrief, III. (Leonard, Heather)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Leonard, Heather)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than November 5, 2020, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/21/20. (BJL)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The court SETS a telephone status conference for 9:00 a.m. on Wednesday, October 21, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/21/20. (BJL) Modified on 10/14/2020 (BJL).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/21/20. (BJL)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tenneco Inc. filed by Tenneco Inc (Vreeland, Albert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tenneco Inc.(Vreeland, Albert)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Tenneco Inc served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (BJL)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tenneco Inc. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Lon Moncrief, III. (Leonard, Heather)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Tenneco Inc filed by Lon Moncrief, III.(BJL)
August 20, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3654827 (B4601107924). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Tenneco Inc filed by Lon Moncrief, III.(BJL). (Leonard, Heather) Modified on 8/21/2020 (BJL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moncrief v. Tenneco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lon Moncrief, III
Represented By: Heather N Leonard
Represented By: Leslie A Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenneco Inc doing business as Federal-Mogul Powertrain
Represented By: Albert L Vreeland, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal-Mogul Powertrain LLC
Represented By: Albert L Vreeland, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?