Stanford v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Shelly Renee Stanford
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2020cv01755
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 11/27/2020, answer due 2/26/2021. (AHI)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to USMS for service as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (AHI)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 11/10/2020. (AHI)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shelly Renee Stanford. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(BJL)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner filed by Shelly Renee Stanford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanford v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Renee Stanford
Represented By: Seth B Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?