Fernandez-Lopez et al v. Hernandez et al
Plaintiff: Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez, Carlos Alfredo Ramirez-Fernandez and Jesus Lamberto Ramirez-Lopez
Defendant: Edwin Reyes, Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc., SLR Labor Works, LLC, Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC, Epigmenio Rodriguez and Gilberto Hernandez
Case Number: 5:2020cv01861
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorney Javier Riojas' motion to appear pro hac vice in this action. (Doc. #72 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 12/29/2020. (YMB)
December 29, 2020 PHV Fee paid for Javier Riojas: $75, receipt number B4601110451. (KEK)
December 23, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Myers Vosburgh on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vosburgh, Jessica)
December 23, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to Appear Admission Pro Hac Vice by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez. (Riojas, Javier)
November 23, 2020 Filing 71 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-00046. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #64 Report and Recommendations; DENYING #26 Motion to Dismiss filed by Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC, Gilberto Hernandez, DENYING #30 Motion to Dismiss filed by Edwin Reyes, Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alia Moses. (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
October 28, 2020 Filing 69 RESPONSE to #67 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Gilberto Hernandez, Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC. (Curette, Stephanie) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 68 RESPONSE to #67 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc., Edwin Reyes. (Hamlin, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 67 OBJECTION to #64 Report and Recommendations Amended by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez.. (Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 66 OBJECTION to #64 Report and Recommendations by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez.. (Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 65 OBJECTION to #64 Report and Recommendations by Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc., Edwin Reyes.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hamlin, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 64 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge Collis White. (jaw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 61 Certified Mail Return Receipt of #57 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 60 Certified Mailing of #57 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice mailed to Attorney Hannah Elizabeth Samson (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 59 Certified Mailing of #57 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice mailed to Attorney Jung Lim Koo (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 58 Certified Mailing of #57 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice mailed to Attorney Vianey Arianna Escudero (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING #54 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order.; GRANTING #55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order.; GRANTING #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Collis White. (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Javier Riojas Hannah Elizabeth Samson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13472098) by on behalf of Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez.. Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Javier Riojas of Vianey Arianna Escudero ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13472075) by on behalf of Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez.. Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Javier Riojas of Jung Lim Koo ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13471991) by on behalf of Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez.. Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 53 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc., Edwin Reyes, re #47 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Surreply to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Plaintiff Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez (Hamlin, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. Signed by Judge Collis White. (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation and Motion for Leave of Court to Respond to Plaintiffs' Surreply to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc., Edwin Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Hamlin, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 50 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Gilberto Hernandez, Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC, re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendant Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC, Defendant Gilberto Hernandez (Curette, Stephanie) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Text Order GRANTING #45 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; GRANTING #45 Motion for Leave to File reply to surreply until March 6, 2020 entered by Judge Collis White. Plaintiffs' motion to strike for exceeding page limit is DENIED AS MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lb) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Text Order GRANTING #42 Motion for Leave to File surreply by February 18, 2020 entered by Judge Collis White. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lb) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Surreply to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez, re #45 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Surreply filed by Defendant Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC, Defendant Gilberto Hernandez (Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation , MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Surreply by Gilberto Hernandez, Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Curette, Stephanie) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 44 Sur-reply to Motion, filed by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez, re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendant Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC, Defendant Gilberto Hernandez (Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc., Edwin Reyes, re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendant Edwin Reyes, Defendant Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc. (Hamlin, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendants Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez.. Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 41 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc., Edwin Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Hamlin, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Gilberto Hernandez, Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC, re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendant Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC, Defendant Gilberto Hernandez (Curette, Stephanie) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc., Edwin Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Hamlin, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Text Order GRANTING #37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until January 31, 2020, entered by Judge Collis White. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lb) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Filing 37 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Gilberto Hernandez, Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Curette, Stephanie) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez, re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendant Edwin Reyes, Defendant Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Text Order GRANTING #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until January 24, 2020 entered by Judge Collis White. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lb) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher L. Hamlin for Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc.,Christopher L. Hamlin for Edwin Reyes. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Collis White. (jaw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Gilberto Hernandez, Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Williams, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Text Order GRANTING #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until January 11, 2020 entered by Judge Collis White. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lb) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 31 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez, re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendant Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC, Defendant Gilberto Hernandez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc., Edwin Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Declaration of Edwin Reyes, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Edwin Reyes' and Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Garza, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 29 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 200026741. (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher L. Hamlin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 200026741).. Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez.. Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Riojas, Javier)[Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Gilberto Hernandez, Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Curette, Stephanie) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Epigmenio Rodriguez, SLR Labor Works, LLC.(Manor, Rogdrick) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Text Order GRANTING #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc. answer due 1/3/2020; Edwin Reyes answer due 1/3/2020. entered by Judge Collis White. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lb) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Text Order GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Epigmenio Rodriguez answer due 12/13/2019; SLR Labor Works, LLC answer due 12/13/2019. entered by Judge Collis White. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lb) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Set Answer deadline: Epigmenio Rodriguez answer due 12/13/2019; SLR Labor Works, LLC answer due 12/13/2019 (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Set Answer Deadlines: Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc. answer due 1/3/2020; EdwinReyes answer due 1/3/2020 (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc., Edwin Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion For Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Garza, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Garza on behalf of Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc., Edwin Reyes. Attorney Robert Garza added to party Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Garza added to party Edwin Reyes(pty:dft) (Garza, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 20 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Responsive Pleading (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Responsive Pleading by Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc., Edwin Reyes.. Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Garza, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez. Edwin Reyes served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez. Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc. served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Epigmenio Rodriguez, SLR Labor Works, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Manor, Rogdrick) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (jaw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Epigmenio Rodriguez, SLR Labor Works, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Manor, Rogdrick) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Gilberto Hernandez answer due 12/13/2019; Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC answer due 12/13/2019. entered by Judge Collis White. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lb) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Answer due 12/13/2019 as to Gilberto Hernandez, Hernandez Demolition &Remediation, LLC (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Original Complaint by Gilberto Hernandez, Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Motions). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Curette, Stephanie) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez. SLR Labor Works, LLC served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez. Epigmenio Rodriguez served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez. Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. (Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez. Gilberto Hernandez served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. (Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Gilberto Hernandez. (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Epigmenio Rodriguez. (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc.. (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SLR Labor Works, LLC. (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Edwin Reyes. (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC. (ls) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
August 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Collis White. (ss) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12431633). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Riojas, Javier) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez-Lopez et al v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Reyes
Represented By: Christopher L. Hamlin
Represented By: Robert Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chameleon Landscaping and Irrigation, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Hamlin
Represented By: Robert Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLR Labor Works, LLC
Represented By: Rogdrick L. Manor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernandez Demolition & Remediation, LLC
Represented By: David Jed Williams
Represented By: Stephanie L. Curette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epigmenio Rodriguez
Represented By: Rogdrick L. Manor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberto Hernandez
Represented By: David Jed Williams
Represented By: Stephanie L. Curette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Alicia Fernandez-Lopez
Represented By: Javier Riojas
Represented By: Jung Lim Koo
Represented By: Vianey Arianna Escudero
Represented By: Hannah Elizabeth Samson
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Alfredo Ramirez-Fernandez
Represented By: Javier Riojas
Represented By: Jung Lim Koo
Represented By: Vianey Arianna Escudero
Represented By: Hannah Elizabeth Samson
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Lamberto Ramirez-Lopez
Represented By: Javier Riojas
Represented By: Jung Lim Koo
Represented By: Vianey Arianna Escudero
Represented By: Hannah Elizabeth Samson
Represented By: Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?