Adams v. Cagle Brothers Concrete Pumping
Plaintiff: Jimmy Adams
Defendant: Cagle Brothers Concrete Pumping
Case Number: 5:2020cv01885
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Miller, Patrick)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than February 11, 2021, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/28/20. (BJL)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The court SETS a telephone status conference for 9:00 a.m. on Wednesday, January 27, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/28/20. (BJL)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/28/20. (BJL)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cagle Brothers Concrete Pumping.(Miller, Patrick)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Cagle Brothers Concrete Pumping served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (BJL)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cagle Brothers Concrete Pumping by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
December 3, 2020 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number H4601004657; H4601004658 (BJL)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Jimmy Adams. (BJL)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Cagle Brothers Concrete Pumping filed by Jimmy Adams.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Cagle Brothers Concrete Pumping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cagle Brothers Concrete Pumping
Represented By: Patrick O'Neal Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Adams
Represented By: John Zachariah Higgs, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?