Ramey v. Credence Resource Management LLC
Plaintiff: Wendy Ramey
Defendant: Credence Resource Management LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00067
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than April 23, 2021, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/9/21. (BJL)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The court SETS a telephone status conference for 10:00 a.m. on Thursday, April 8, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/9/21. (BJL)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/9/21. (BJL)
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Credence Resource Management LLC. filed by Credence Resource Management LLC (Nettles, Laura)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 Credence Resource Management, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Credence Resource Management LLC.(Nettles, Laura)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wendy Ramey. Credence Resource Management LLC served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. (BJL)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Credence Resource Management LLC. mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Wendy Ramey (Sykstus, Ronald)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/19/21. (BJL)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps Motion is RIPE 1/15/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Wendy Ramey. (BJL)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Wendy Ramey. (BJL)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Credence Resource Management LLC filed by Wendy Ramey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(BJL)
January 15, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3755018 (B4601110855). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Credence Resource Management LLC filed by Wendy Ramey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(BJL). (Philipps, David) Modified on 1/20/2021 (BJL).
January 15, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3755029 (B4601110857). (Philipps, David) Modified on 1/20/2021 (BJL).
January 15, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3755024 (B4601110856). (Philipps, David) Modified on 1/20/2021 (BJL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramey v. Credence Resource Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credence Resource Management LLC
Represented By: Laura Catherine Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Ramey
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?