Thornton v. Southern Management Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany E Thornton
Defendant: Southern Management Corporation and Covington Credit of Alabama Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv00233
Filed: February 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Denzel Efemena Okinedo on behalf of Covington Credit of Alabama Inc, Southern Management Corporation (Okinedo, Denzel)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 3/17/2021. (AHI)
February 19, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3780456 (B4601111560). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southern Management Corporation and Covington Credit of Alabama Inc from Circuit Court of Limestone County, Alabama, case number 44-cv-2019-900303 filed by Southern Management Corporation and Covington Credit of Alabama Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 part 3)(AHI). (Threadcraft, Joshua) Modified on 2/22/2021 (BJL).
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Covington Credit of Alabama Inc. filed by Covington Credit of Alabama Inc Associated Cases: 5:21-cv-00233-LCB, 5:19-cv-01523-LCB(Okinedo, Denzel)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Management Corporation. filed by Southern Management Corporation Associated Cases: 5:21-cv-00233-LCB, 5:19-cv-01523-LCB(Okinedo, Denzel)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Covington Credit of Alabama Inc re (3 in 5:21-cv-00233-LCB) Answer to Amended Complaint, (1 in 5:21-cv-00233-LCB) Notice of Removal, Notice of Amendment to Certificate of Service for Notice of Removal and Answer to Second Amended Complaint Associated Cases: 5:21-cv-00233-LCB, 5:19-cv-01523-LCB(Threadcraft, Joshua)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Southern Management Corporation re (2 in 5:21-cv-00233-LCB) Answer to Amended Complaint, (1 in 5:21-cv-00233-LCB) Notice of Removal, Notice of Amendment to Certificate of Service for Notice of Removal and Answer to Second Amended Complaint Associated Cases: 5:21-cv-00233-LCB, 5:19-cv-01523-LCB(Threadcraft, Joshua)
February 15, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to SECOND Amended Complaint by Covington Credit of Alabama Inc.(AHI )
February 15, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to SECOND Amended Complaint by Southern Management Corporation.(AHI)
February 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southern Management Corporation and Covington Credit of Alabama Inc from Circuit Court of Limestone County, Alabama, case number 44-cv-2019-900303 filed by Southern Management Corporation and Covington Credit of Alabama Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 part 3)(AHI)
February 15, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by Southern Management Corporation filed in civil action number 5;19-cv-1523-LCB as document #15 on 10/11/2019(AHI)
February 15, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by Covington Credit of Alabama Inc in civil action number 5:19-cv-1523-LCB as document #14 on 10/11/2019(AHI)
February 15, 2021 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Covington Credit of Alabama Inc and Southern Management Corporation filed by Tiffany E Thornton in civil action number 5:19-cv-1523-LCB as document #22 on 10/27/2019(AHI)
February 15, 2021 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Covington Credit of Alabama Inc filed in civil action number 5:19-cv-1523-LCB as document #28 on 11/12/2019(AHI)
February 15, 2021 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Covington Credit of Alabama Inc and Southern Management Corporation filed by Tiffany E Thornton in state case 44-cv-2019-900303 as document #73 on 2/3/2021.(AHI)
February 15, 2021 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Southern Management Corporation in civil action number 5:19-cv-1523-LCB as document #29 on 11/12/2019 (AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornton v. Southern Management Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany E Thornton
Represented By: George Keith Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Management Corporation
Represented By: Joshua H Threadcraft
Represented By: Denzel Efemena Okinedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covington Credit of Alabama Inc
Represented By: Joshua H Threadcraft
Represented By: Denzel Efemena Okinedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?