G2 Turftools Inc v. Johnston Seed Company LLC
Plaintiff: G2 Turftools Inc
Defendant: Johnston Seed Company LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00253
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 4/14/2021. (SHB, )
March 23, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number H4601004763 for Tynia A. Watson (AHI )
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave for John R. Perkins, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/19/21. (BJL)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave for Tynia A. Watson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/19/21. (BJL)
March 19, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 3/19/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by G2 Turftools Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Sebesta, Patrick)
March 19, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3800652 (B4601112131). (Sebesta, Patrick) Modified on 3/26/2021 (BJL).
March 18, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 3/18/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Johnston Seed Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dodgen, Walter)
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter A Dodgen, Jr on behalf of Johnston Seed Company LLC (Dodgen, Walter)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than May 3, 2021, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/17/21. (BJL)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The court SETS a telephone status conference for 10:00 a.m. on Wednesday, April 14, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/17/21. (BJL)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/17/21. (BJL)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnston Seed Company LLC. filed by Johnston Seed Company LLC (Mardis, Zachary)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Johnston Seed Company LLC.(Mardis, Zachary)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint against Johnston Seed Company, LLC, served on Joseph L. Meiborgen on February 24, 2021, filed by G2 Turftools Inc. (Sebesta, Patrick)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Johnston Seed Company LLC. (AHI )
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial (AHI)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by G2 Turftools Inc (AHI)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnston Seed Company LLC filed by G2 Turftools Inc.(AHI )
February 19, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number H4601004733 (AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G2 Turftools Inc v. Johnston Seed Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnston Seed Company LLC
Represented By: Walter A Dodgen, Jr
Represented By: Zachary Paul Mardis
Represented By: Tynia A Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G2 Turftools Inc
Represented By: Patrick E Sebesta, II
Represented By: John Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?