Gregory v. Medicredit Inc
Plaintiff: Airielle Gregory and Scott
Defendant: Medicredit Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv00259
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Medicredit Inc.(Shepard, Tazewell)
April 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Defendants Unopposed Second Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by Twenty-One (21) Days by Medicredit Inc. (Shepard, Tazewell)
April 12, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Airielle Gregory. Medicredit Inc served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (AKD)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The unopposed motion for extension of time to file responsive pleading, doc. #8 , is GRANTED. The Defendant's responsive pleading is due April 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 3/19/2021. (KEK)
March 19, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint by Twenty-One (21) Days by Medicredit Inc. (Shepard, Tazewell)
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tazewell T Shepard, IV on behalf of Medicredit Inc (Shepard, Tazewell)
March 19, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Medicredit Inc answer due 4/16/2021. (KEK)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Medicredit Inc. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 02/24/2021. (AKD)
February 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Airielle Gregory (Sykstus, Ronald)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps by Ronald Sykstus. (AKD)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Airielle Gregory. (AKD)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medicredit Inc, filed by Airielle Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(AKD)
February 19, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3781092 (ALND B4601111571). (Philipps, David) Modified on 2/22/2021 (KEK).
February 19, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3781099 (ALND B4601111572). (Philipps, David) Modified on 2/22/2021 (KEK).
February 19, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3781088 (ALND B4601111570) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Medicredit Inc, filed by Airielle Gregory. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(AKD). (Philipps, David) Modified on 2/22/2021 (KEK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Medicredit Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airielle Gregory
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicredit Inc
Represented By: Tazewell T Shepard, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?