White v. DAKS, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jereamy White
Defendant: DAKS, Inc, Mahmood Ebhahim and Danish W. Dhedhi
Case Number: 5:2021cv00303
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: the court hereby ORDERS the Clerk to administratively close this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/1/21. (BJL)
May 28, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DAKS, Inc. filed by DAKS, Inc (Walston, David)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. The court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by May 28, 2021. Defendants shall file any reply by June 11, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/14/21. (BJL)
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Motion is RIPE 5/14/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Jereamy White. (Hughes, David)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for 5/13/21 is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/12/21. (BJL)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time and Stay of Proceedings as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/30/21. (BJL)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs Motion is RIPE 4/29/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by DAKS, Inc. (Walston, David)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: the parties are notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than May 31, 2021, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/16/21. (BJL)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/16/21. (BJL) Modified on 5/12/2021 (BJL).
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff shall respond to Motion to Dismiss within 14 days. Defendants shall reply within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/16/21. (BJL)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by DAKS, Inc, Danish W. Dhedhi, Mahmood Ebhahim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement)(Walston, David)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants DAKS, Inc., Danish W. Dhedhi, and Mahmood Ebhahim shall file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by April 16, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on March 25, 2021. (HKM)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 3/25/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by DAKS, Inc. (Walston, David)
March 5, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3791645 (B4601111898). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Jereamy White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(BJL). (Hughes, David) Modified on 3/9/2021 (BJL).
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Jereamy White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. DAKS, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAKS, Inc
Represented By: David B Walston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahmood Ebhahim
Represented By: David B Walston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danish W. Dhedhi
Represented By: David B Walston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jereamy White
Represented By: David A Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?