Baker v. City of Madison, Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Baker
Defendant: Dion Hose, City of Madison, Alabama and Daniel Nunez
Case Number: 5:2021cv00382
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - The Court MOOTS the #13 MOTION for Discovery; GRANTS the #11 MOTION to Stay and this action is STAYED pending the Court's ruling on the motions to dismiss; DENIES the #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel; and #18 MOTION to Continue is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Plaintiff has until 5/20/2021 to supplement his response to the motions to dismiss, any replies are due by 6/3/2021. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/29/2021. (AHI)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Continue Rule 12b6 by Curtis Baker. (AHI)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Discovery (Amended) filed by City of Madison, Alabama, Dion Hose. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A)(Canupp, David)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Discovery filed by City of Madison, Alabama, Dion Hose. (Canupp, David)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Brief re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Madison, Alabama. (Canupp, David)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Madison, Alabama. (Canupp, David)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Discovery regarding the Body Cam Footage of incident on 3/19/2019 by Curtis Baker. (AHI)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Please use case number 5:21-cv-382-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Stay by Dion Hose. (Canupp, David)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by Dion Hose re #8 MOTION to Dismiss of Conventional Filing of Evidence (Canupp, David)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Brief re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dion Hose. (Canupp, David)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Dion Hose. (Canupp, David)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Curtis Baker. (AHI)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curtis Baker. City of Madison, Alabama served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. (BJL)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee by Curtis Baker for defendant, Dion Hose (AHI)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Curtis Baker. (BJL)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402.00 - H4601004754) filed by Curtis Baker.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. City of Madison, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dion Hose
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Madison, Alabama
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?