Ake v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Amanda Ake
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 5:2021cv00411
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference set for 6/9/21 is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/11/21. (BJL)
May 11, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Amanda Ake and Life Insurance Company of North America. (BJL)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than June 24, 2021, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/10/21. (BJL)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The court SETS a telephone status conference for 9:30 a.m. on Wednesday, June 9, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/10/21. (BJL) Modified on 5/11/2021 (BJL).
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/10/21. (BJL)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Wahlheim, William)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by May 10, 2021.Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on April 23, 2021. (HKM)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America. filed by Life Insurance Company of North America (Murphy, Grace)
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 4/23/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Murphy, Grace)
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Ake. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (BJL)
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (AHI)
March 19, 2021 Request for service by certified mail contained within the body of the complaint filed by Amanda Ake. (AHI)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America filed by Amanda Ake.(BJL)
March 19, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3800668 (B4601112132). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America filed by Amanda Ake.(BJL). (Williams, Miles) Modified on 3/26/2021 (BJL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ake v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Matthew S Edinger
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Represented By: William B Wahlheim, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Ake
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?