Fletcher v. Madison County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Christopher M Fletcher
Defendant: Madison County Sheriff's Department and Justin Nance
Case Number: 5:2021cv01101
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Madison County Sheriff's Department; Plaintiff's response is due by October 4, 2021, defendants' reply, if any, is due by October 8, 2021. The parties are reminded of the briefing schedule outlined in Apendix III attached hereto. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 09/23/2021. (AKD)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 Brief re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Madison County Sheriff's Department. (Canupp, David)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Madison County Sheriff's Department. (Canupp, David)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher M Fletcher. Madison County Sheriff's Department served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (No date on greencard). (AKD)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Justin Nance. Delivered to plaintiff for service. (AKD)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher M Fletcher. Madison County Sheriff's Department served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (AKD)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Madison County Sheriff's Department. Delivered to Plaintiff for service. (AKD)
August 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Madison County Sheriff's Department, Justin Nance, filed by Christopher M Fletcher.(AKD)
August 12, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number H4601034896 (AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fletcher v. Madison County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher M Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: David J Canupp
Represented By: George W Royer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Nance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?