Martinson v. Southern Health Partners, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Douglas C. Martinson, II
Defendant: Southern Health Partners, Inc., Sara Connell, Crystal Cottrell, Nioca Manley, Sonya Moore, Tayana Millwood, Kyna Speak, Dustin Vickers, Felicia Deshields, Joshua Boyd, Nicholas Wallace, Matthew Hill, Terry Barlowe, Mark Martin, William Oliver and Chrystal Adams
Case Number: 5:2021cv01144
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Plaintiff to respond to Motion to Dismiss within 14 days; Defendants may reply within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/12/21. (BJL)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Hayes Nolen on behalf of Chrystal Adams, Terry Barlowe, Felicia Deshields, Mark Martin, William Oliver, Nicholas Wallace (Nolen, Justin)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chrystal Adams, Terry Barlowe, Felicia Deshields, Mark Martin, William Oliver, Nicholas Wallace.(May, T)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Sara Connell, Crystal Cottrell, Nioca Manley, Tayana Millwood, Sonya Moore, Southern Health Partners, Inc., Kyna Speak, Dustin Vickers. (Lunsford, William)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss by Sara Connell, Crystal Cottrell, Nioca Manley, Tayana Millwood, Sonya Moore, Southern Health Partners, Inc., Kyna Speak, Dustin Vickers. (Lunsford, William)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William R Lunsford on behalf of Sara Connell, Crystal Cottrell, Nioca Manley, Tayana Millwood, Sonya Moore, Southern Health Partners, Inc., Kyna Speak, Dustin Vickers (Lunsford, William)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B Reeves on behalf of Sara Connell, Crystal Cottrell, Nioca Manley, Tayana Millwood, Sonya Moore, Southern Health Partners, Inc., Kyna Speak, Dustin Vickers (Reeves, Matthew)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas C. Martinson, II. Tayana Millwood served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (BJL)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas C. Martinson, II. Southern Health Partners, Inc. served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (BJL)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas C. Martinson, II. Chrystal Adams served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021; Sonya Moore served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021; Dustin Vickers served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. (BJL)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas C. Martinson, II. Felicia Deshields served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021; Nioca Manley served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021; Mark Martin served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021; Kyna Speak served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (BJL)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas C. Martinson, II. Terry Barlowe served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021; Sara Connell served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021; Crystal Cottrell served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021; William Oliver served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021; Nicholas Wallace served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (BJL)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Chrystal Adams, Terry Barlowe, Joshua Boyd, Sara Connell, Crystal Cottrell, Felicia Deshields, Matthew Hill, Nioca Manley, Mark Martin, Tayana Millwood, Sonya Moore, William Oliver, Southern Health Partners, Inc., Kyna Speak, Dustin Vickers, and Nicholas Wallace. (AHI)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3909444 (B4601115338). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Douglas C. Martinson, II.(BJL). (Sherrod, Henry) Modified on 8/24/2021 (BJL).
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Douglas C. Martinson, II. (BJL)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Douglas C. Martinson, II.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinson v. Southern Health Partners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas C. Martinson, II
Represented By: Henry F Sherrod, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew B Reeves
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Connell
Represented By: Matthew B Reeves
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Cottrell
Represented By: Matthew B Reeves
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nioca Manley
Represented By: Matthew B Reeves
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Moore
Represented By: Matthew B Reeves
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tayana Millwood
Represented By: Matthew B Reeves
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyna Speak
Represented By: Matthew B Reeves
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Vickers
Represented By: Matthew B Reeves
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Deshields
Represented By: T Kelly May
Represented By: Justin Hayes Nolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Wallace
Represented By: T Kelly May
Represented By: Justin Hayes Nolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Barlowe
Represented By: T Kelly May
Represented By: Justin Hayes Nolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Martin
Represented By: T Kelly May
Represented By: Justin Hayes Nolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Oliver
Represented By: T Kelly May
Represented By: Justin Hayes Nolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrystal Adams
Represented By: T Kelly May
Represented By: Justin Hayes Nolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?