Boyd v. Midland Credit Management Inc
Plaintiff: Deborah Boyd
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv01172
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The Court GRANTS the #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Midland Credit Management Inc answer due 11/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/14/2021. (AHI)
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 10/13/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. (Tompkins, Jason)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Boyd. Midland Credit Management Inc served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (BJL)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management Inc by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Deborah Boyd (Sykstus, Ronald)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David J. Philipps and Mary Elizabeth Philipps. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/26/21. (BJL)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (AHI)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV for Mary Philipps and David Philipps Motion is RIPE 8/26/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Deborah Boyd. (AHI )
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Deborah Boyd. (AHI)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Midland Credit Management Inc filed by Deborah Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(AHI)
August 26, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3913322 (B4601115444). (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/27/2021 (BJL).
August 26, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3913316 (B4601115442). related document #1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Midland Credit Management Inc filed by Deborah Boyd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(AHI). (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/27/2021 (BJL).
August 26, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3913320 (B4601115443). (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/27/2021 (BJL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Midland Credit Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Boyd
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Inc
Represented By: Jason B Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?