Patel et al v. Mendoza et al
Plaintiff: Kimjalben Patel and Paranavkumar Patel
Defendant: Ur Mendoza, Nicolas Bartell and Merrick B. Garland
Case Number: 5:2021cv01375
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paranavkumar Patel, Kimjalben Patel. Nicolas Bartell served on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022; Merrick B. Garland served on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022; Ur Mendoza served on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Rozdzielski, Jennifer)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Nicolas Bartell, Merrick B. Garland, Ur Mendoza, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (AHI)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer Rozdzielski by Kimjalben Patel, Paranavkumar Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rozdzielski, Jennifer)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nicolas Bartell, Merrick B. Garland, and Ur Mendoza filed by Paranavkumar Patel and Kimjalben Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(AHI)
October 15, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3944327. (Rozdzielski, Jennifer)
October 15, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3944299 (B4601116394). (Rozdzielski, Jennifer) Modified on 10/19/2021 (AHI).
October 15, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3944278 (B4601116393). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Nicolas Bartell, Merrick B. Garland, and Ur Mendoza filed by Paranavkumar Patel and Kimjalben Patel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(AHI). (Rozdzielski, Jennifer) Modified on 10/19/2021 (AHI).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. Mendoza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimjalben Patel
Represented By: Jennifer Rozdzielski
Represented By: Sunny Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paranavkumar Patel
Represented By: Sunny Shah
Represented By: Jennifer Rozdzielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolas Bartell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?