Shukla et al v. Jaddou
Plaintiff: Niravkumar Nalichandra Shukla and Nikitaben Niravkumar Shukla
Defendant: Ur Jaddou
Case Number: 5:2021cv01465
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Niravkumar Nalichandra Shukla, Nikitaben Niravkumar Shukla. Ur Jaddou served on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipt)(Banias, Bradley)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ur Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 HAIKALA CHAMBERS INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/12/2021. (KEK)
November 10, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3960399. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Ur Jaddou, filed by Niravkumar Nalichandra Shukla, Nikitaben Niravkumar Shukla. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KEK). (Banias, Bradley)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorney Bradley B. Banias' motion for admission pro hac vice in this action. (Doc. #2 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/3/2021. (YMB)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bradley B. Banias by Nikitaben Niravkumar Shukla, Niravkumar Nalichandra Shukla. (Attachments: #1 Bradley Banias Certificate of Good Standing - State, #2 Bradley Banias Certificate of Good Standing - SCD)(Gregory, Steven)
November 3, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3955546. (Gregory, Steven)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ur Jaddou, filed by Niravkumar Nalichandra Shukla, Nikitaben Niravkumar Shukla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shukla et al v. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niravkumar Nalichandra Shukla
Represented By: Steven P Gregory
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikitaben Niravkumar Shukla
Represented By: Steven P Gregory
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?