FGH Corporate Park LTD v. Arrow Electronics Inc
Plaintiff: FGH Corporate Park LTD
Defendant: Arrow Electronics Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv01509
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 1/3/2022. (SHB, )
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/28/2021. (MJL)
December 27, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by FGH Corporate Park LTD. (Sipes, Jade)
December 20, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Carroll, Desharne)
December 10, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Arrow Electronics Inc.(Carroll, Desharne)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than January 17, 2022, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/6/21. (BJL)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The court SETS a telephone status conference for 9:30 a.m. on Monday, January 3, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/6/21. (BJL)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Defendant to respond to Motion to Remand within 14 days; Plaintiff may reply 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/6/21. (BJL)
December 3, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 11/26/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed filed by FGH Corporate Park LTD. (Sipes, Jade)
December 3, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by FGH Corporate Park LTD. (Sipes, Jade)
December 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jade E Sipes on behalf of FGH Corporate Park LTD (Sipes, Jade)
December 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Cahill on behalf of FGH Corporate Park LTD (Cahill, Matthew)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/1/21. (BJL)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Allen C. Miller Motion is RIPE 11/29/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Carroll, Desharne)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff to respond to Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer within 4 days; Defendant may reply 3 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/29/21. (BJL)
November 29, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3969181 (B4601117150). (Carroll, Desharne) Modified on 12/1/2021 (BJL).
November 26, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 11/26/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Carroll, Desharne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FGH Corporate Park LTD v. Arrow Electronics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FGH Corporate Park LTD
Represented By: David B Anderson
Represented By: Deanna L Weidner
Represented By: Jade E Sipes
Represented By: Matthew M Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Electronics Inc
Represented By: Desharne Carroll
Represented By: Allen C Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?