Kirby v. Sysco Company et al
Plaintiff: Gerry Kirby
Defendant: Sysco Company and James Hamilton Hall
Case Number: 5:2021cv01723
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/1/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2023. The parties shall be ready for trial to be scheduled on or after July 3, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/11/22. (BJL)
February 10, 2022 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Maples, Marcus)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/20/22. (BJL)
January 20, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sysco Company.(Maples, Marcus)
January 20, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by James Hamilton Hall.(Maples, Marcus)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants, defendants answer is due by 1/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/19/2022. (AHI)
January 19, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 1/19/2022. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Sysco Company. (Maples, Marcus)
January 13, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by James Hamilton Hall, Gerry Kirby, and Sysco Company. (BJL)
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Gerry Kirby re #1 Notice of Removal (Rice, Richard)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James Hamilton Hall and Sysco Company from The Circuit Court of Limestone County, Alabama, case number 44-CV-2021-900260. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirby v. Sysco Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Kirby
Represented By: Richard Allan Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysco Company
Represented By: Marcus Monte Maples
Represented By: Rodney Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hamilton Hall
Represented By: Marcus Monte Maples
Represented By: Rodney Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?