Webb v. Walmart Inc
Plaintiff: Diana Webb
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Case Number: 5:2022cv00044
Filed: January 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 HAIKALA CHAMBERS INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 1/28/2022. (KEK)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Diana Webb. Walmart Inc waiver sent on 1/26/2022, answer due 3/27/2022. (Mastando, Teresa)
January 24, 2022 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3999615. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Walmart Inc, filed by Diana Webb. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KEK). (Mastando, Teresa)
January 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walmart Inc, filed by Diana Webb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Webb
Represented By: Eric J Artrip
Represented By: Teresa Ryder Mastando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?