Jones et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Schrade Jones and Carter Gilliam
Defendant: United States of America and Tennessee Valley Authority
Case Number: 5:2022cv00620
Filed: May 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Schrade Jones, Carter Gilliam. Tennessee Valley Authority served on 5/18/2022, answer due 7/18/2022; United States of America served on 5/23/2022, answer due 7/23/2022. (Rouse, Franklin) Modified on 5/31/2022 (AHI).
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Tennessee Valley Authority and United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (AHI)
May 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Schrade Jones, Carter Gilliam.(AHI)
May 13, 2022 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4085552 (B4601120257). related document #1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Schrade Jones, Carter Gilliam.(AHI). (Rouse, Franklin) Modified on 5/16/2022 (AHI).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schrade Jones
Represented By: Franklin Taylor Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carter Gilliam
Represented By: Franklin Taylor Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Valley Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?