Blair et al v. Whitetail Vessel Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Annette C. Blair, Tina Hitchcock and Hannah Smith
Defendant: Whitetail Vessel Company LLC, Inland Marine Service Inc and Joseph Baer
Case Number: 5:2022cv00655
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B4601121127 (AHI)
July 7, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Robert Nienhuis by Whitetail Vessel Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Witcher, James)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Bennett A. Midlo. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/6/22. (SPT )
July 6, 2022 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4119435 (B4601121090). (Hale, Carson) Modified on 7/7/2022 (AHI).
June 30, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bennett Avram Midlo by Annette C. Blair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hale, Carson)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Todd M. Powers. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/28/22. (SPT )
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah E. Schild. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/28/22. (SPT )
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Megan Ahrens Sullivan. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/28/22. (SPT )
June 27, 2022 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B4601120933 for Sarah E. Schild (AHI)
June 27, 2022 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B4601120932 Todd M. Powers (AHI)
June 27, 2022 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B4601120934 for Megan A. Sullivan (AHI)
June 24, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Todd M. Powers by Joseph Baer, Inland Marine Service Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Witcher, James)
June 24, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Sarah E. Schild by Joseph Baer, Inland Marine Service Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Witcher, James)
June 24, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Megan Ahrens Sullivan by Joseph Baer, Inland Marine Service Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Witcher, James)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 6/30/2023; Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2023; Witness and Exhibit Lists due by 8/21/2023; Trial ready by 9/2023; A Telephone Status Conference is set for 4/13/2023 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/23/2022. (AHI)
June 22, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Annette C. Blair.(Hale, Carson)
June 22, 2022 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Witcher, James)
June 16, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Joseph Baer by Clerk and mailed to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (BJL)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/14/2022. (AHI)
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Inland Marine Service Inc, Whitetail Vessel Company LLC. filed by Inland Marine Service Inc, Whitetail Vessel Company LLC (Witcher, James)
May 24, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Annette C. Blair by Joseph Baer, Whitetail Vessel Company LLC, Inland Marine Service Inc.(Witcher, James)
May 24, 2022 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4092515 (B4601120414). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH PLAINTIFF JURY DEMAND by Joseph Baer, Whitetail Vessel Company LLC, and Inland Marine Service Inc from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Alabama, case number 39-cv-2022-90047.00 filed by Joseph Baer, Whitetail Vessel Company LLC, and Inland Marine Service Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(AHI). (Witcher, James) Modified on 5/25/2022 (AHI).
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH PLAINTIFF JURY DEMAND by Joseph Baer, Whitetail Vessel Company LLC, and Inland Marine Service Inc from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Alabama, case number 39-cv-2022-90047.00 filed by Joseph Baer, Whitetail Vessel Company LLC, and Inland Marine Service Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair et al v. Whitetail Vessel Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette C. Blair
Represented By: Carson Scott Hale
Represented By: Bennett A. Midlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Hitchcock
Represented By: Carson Scott Hale
Represented By: Bennett A. Midlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Smith
Represented By: Carson Scott Hale
Represented By: Bennett A. Midlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitetail Vessel Company LLC
Represented By: James S Witcher, III
Represented By: Megan A. Sullivan
Represented By: Robert Nienhuis
Represented By: Sarah E. Schild
Represented By: Todd Matthew Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inland Marine Service Inc
Represented By: James S Witcher, III
Represented By: Megan A. Sullivan
Represented By: Sarah E. Schild
Represented By: Todd Matthew Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Baer
Represented By: James S Witcher, III
Represented By: Megan A. Sullivan
Represented By: Sarah E. Schild
Represented By: Todd Matthew Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?