McCafferrey v. Maplebear Inc d/b/a Instacart
Plaintiff: Denise K. McCafferrey
Defendant: Maplebear Inc d/b/a Instacart
Case Number: 5:2022cv00764
Filed: June 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court DENIES plaintiff's motion for reconsideration as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/11/2022. (AHI)
August 10, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE to Judge Regarding the dismissal of case by Denise K. McCafferrey (AHI)
August 10, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Court's #9 Order of Dismissal filed by Denise K. McCafferrey. (AHI)
August 5, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Miscellaneous Filing by Denise K. McCafferrey (BJL)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE this action for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/1/2022. (AHI)
July 29, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE to Court of Plaintiff's Declaration by Denise K. McCafferrey (AHI)
July 29, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing: Letter to the Court and Additional State Court Documents by Denise K. McCafferrey. (Attachments: #1 Document 1, #2 Document 2, #3 Document 3, #4 Envelope)(KEK)
July 27, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE to Court of Plaintiff's Declaration by Denise K. McCafferrey (AHI)
July 27, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE to Court of Plaintiff's Declaration by Denise K. McCafferrey (AHI)
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Liles C. Burke. Judge Magistrate Judge Herman N. Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 5:22-cv-764-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. (BJL)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign the case to a District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/22/22. (BJL)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: the court ORDERS Plaintiff to pay the full filing fee, or to submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, within 21 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/23/22. (BJL)
June 22, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
June 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maplebear Inc d/b/a Instacart filed by Denise K. McCafferrey.(BJL)
June 16, 2022 Partial Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number B4601120864 (BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCafferrey v. Maplebear Inc d/b/a Instacart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise K. McCafferrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maplebear Inc d/b/a Instacart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?