Staggers v. Alabama, State of
Petitioner: Gary Staggers
Respondent: Alabama, State of
Case Number: 5:2022cv00795
Filed: June 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2022 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Gary Staggers (KAM)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER The court ORDERS Staggers to comply with the court's June 29, 2022, Order within 21 days. The court FURTHER ORDERS Staggers to file a notice within 21 days stating (1) whether Staggers has been released from custody; (2) his current mailing address; and (3) whether he wishes to continue prosecuting his claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/2/2022. (SRD)
August 1, 2022 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Gary Staggers (Doc #3 ). (KEK)
July 12, 2022 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Gary Staggers (Doc #2 ). (KEK)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER The petitioner must correct the deficiencies within 30 days. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to re-docket this action as one under 28 U.S.C. 2241 and serve a copy of the form application to proceed in forma pauperis as well as the form for 2241 habeas actions on the petitioner along with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 2241 Form)(SRD)
June 28, 2022 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re: case number. (KEK)
June 28, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Gary Staggers.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staggers v. Alabama, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Staggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alabama, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?