McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce LLC v. Estate of Helen W Caudle et al
Plaintiff: McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce LLC
Defendant: Estate of Helen W Caudle, Estate of Jimmy D Caudle Sr, Jimmy D Caudle, Jr, Christopher H Caudle, Timothy L Caudle, First-Citizens Bank & Trust Co, United States of America and Small Business Administration
Case Number: 5:2022cv00951
Filed: July 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint filed by the United States of America on behalf and by Small Business Administration.(O'Neal, Richard)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The United States has filed an unopposed motion to substitute the Small Business Administration for First-Citizens Bank & Trust Co. (Doc. #8 ). The United States indicates that First-Citizens has assigned its judgment to the Small Business Administration and has attached a copy of the notarized assignment filed in CV-2011-9000954 in the Circuit Court of Madison County. (Doc. [8-1]). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c), the Court grants the United States motion and asks the Clerk to please terminate First-Citizens Bank & Trust Co. as a party and to substitute the Small Business Administration as a defendant. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/8/2022. (DNW)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 HAIKALA CHAMBERS INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/29/2022. (DNW)
August 25, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by the United States of America on behalf of its agency, the Small Business Adninistration by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(O'Neal, Richard)
August 23, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Christopher H Caudle, Jimmy D Caudle, Jr, Timothy L Caudle, Estate of Helen W Caudle, Estate of Jimmy D Caudle Sr.(Maples, Stuart)
August 23, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by the United States of America on behalf of its agency the United States Department of Treasury/Internal Revenue Service by United States of America.(O'Neal, Richard)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS #4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Christopher H Caudle answer due 8/25/2022; Jimmy D Caudle, Jr answer due 8/25/2022; Timothy L Caudle answer due 8/25/2022; First-Citizens Bank & Trust Co answer due 8/25/2022; United States of America answer due 8/25/2022. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/5/2022. (DNW)
August 4, 2022 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Co. (Shaver, Andrew)
August 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart M Maples on behalf of Christopher H Caudle, Jimmy D Caudle, Jr, Timothy L Caudle, Estate of Helen W Caudle, Estate of Jimmy D Caudle Sr (Maples, Stuart)
August 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew James Shaver on behalf of First-Citizens Bank & Trust Co (Shaver, Andrew)
July 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-cv-2022-900723. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3a, #4 Exhibit 3b, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(KEK)
July 28, 2022 State court complaint deemed filed 6/28/2022. See Doc #1 , Exhibit 1. (KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce LLC v. Estate of Helen W Caudle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce LLC
Represented By: G Alicia Jett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Helen W Caudle
Represented By: Stuart M Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Jimmy D Caudle Sr
Represented By: Stuart M Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy D Caudle, Jr
Represented By: Stuart M Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher H Caudle
Represented By: Stuart M Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy L Caudle
Represented By: Stuart M Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First-Citizens Bank & Trust Co
Represented By: Andrew James Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Represented By: Richard E O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Business Administration
Represented By: Richard E O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?