Phillips v. Toney et al
Petitioner: Kristopher Dale Phillips
Respondent: Deborah Toney and Attorney General for the State of Alabama, The
Case Number: 5:2022cv01150
Filed: September 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER-The purpose of this order is to notify the petitioner that the court deems this case to be ripe for summary disposition under Rule 8(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases on the basis of the defenses in the Answer. For this reason, it is ORDERED that the petitioner must file a reply addressing the defenses in the Answer within 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 11/03/2022. (AKD)
November 3, 2022 MOTION of Respondents treating Answer #4 as a motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to Order #5 . (AKD)
October 26, 2022 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Attorney General for the State of Alabama, The, Deborah Toney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Vol 1, #2 Exhibit A - Vol 2, #3 Exhibit A - Vol 3, #4 Exhibit A - Vol 4, #5 Exhibit A - Vol 5, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit K2, #17 Exhibit K3, #18 Exhibit L, #19 Exhibit M, #20 Exhibit N - Suppl. Remand Vol 1 (part 1), #21 Exhibit N - Suppl. Remand Vol 1 (part 2), #22 Exhibit O - Suppl. Remand Vol 2, #23 Exhibit P, #24 Exhibit Q - Suppl. 2 Vol 1, #25 Exhibit R - Suppl. 2 Vol 2, #26 Exhibit S, #27 Exhibit T, #28 Exhibit U, #29 Exhibit V, #30 Exhibit W, #31 Exhibit X, #32 Exhibit Y, #33 Exhibit Z, #34 Exhibit FF1 - Vol 1 (part 1), #35 Exhibit FF1 - Vol 1 (part 2), #36 Exhibit FF2 - Vol 2, #37 Exhibit GG1 - Suppl. 1 Vol 1, #38 Exhibit GG2 - Suppl. 1 Vol 2, #39 Exhibit HH1 - Suppl. 1 Vol 1, #40 Exhibit HH2 - Suppl. 1 Vol 2, #41 Exhibit II, #42 Exhibit JJ, #43 Exhibit KK, #44 Exhibit LL, #45 Exhibit MM, #46 Exhibit NN, #47 Exhibit OO, #48 Exhibit PP)(Dill, William)
October 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William D Dill on behalf of Attorney General for the State of Alabama, The, Deborah Toney (Dill, William)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-Accordingly, the respondents are ORDERED to appear and show cause in writing within 30 days why the petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 09/26/2022. (AKD)
September 9, 2022 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number B-1049 (AKD)
September 8, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kristopher Dale Phillips.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Toney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kristopher Dale Phillips
Represented By: Roger C Appell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deborah Toney
Represented By: William D Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General for the State of Alabama, The
Represented By: William D Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?